PA SB748 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for obedience to authorized persons directing traffic; and providing for drivers of certified escort vehicles; in other required equipment, further providing for identification of certain vehicles; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for scope and application of chapter and for conditions of permits and security for damages.
Title
In general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for obedience to authorized persons directing traffic; and providing for drivers of certified escort vehicles; in other required equipment, further providing for identification of certain vehicles; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for scope and application of chapter and for conditions of permits and security for damages.
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Jacob Corman [R] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-20 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 748 PN 1313, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 748 PN 1313, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Floor: SB 748 PN 1264, FP (Y: 187 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Floor: SB 748 PN 1186, 2015 A3159, CARROLL (Y: 193 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03121 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03121 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 748 PN 790, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 748 PN 1313, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 748 PN 1313, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - House Floor: SB 748 PN 1264, FP (Y: 187 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Floor: SB 748 PN 1186, 2015 A3159, CARROLL (Y: 193 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03121 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03121 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 748 PN 790, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-30 | House | Act No. 55 |
2015-10-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-10-21 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-10-21 | House | Signed in House |
2015-10-20 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (194-3) |
2015-10-20 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-10-19 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-10-14 | House | In the House |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (49-0) |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2015-09-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-09-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-6) |
2015-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-08-25 | House | Removed from table |
2015-07-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-07-22 | House | First consideration |
2015-07-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-06-28 | House | In the House |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |