PA SB741 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-18 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-18 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in facilities and supplies, further providing for deposits into account; and repealing provisions relating to expiration of chapter.
Title
In facilities and supplies, further providing for deposits into account; and repealing provisions relating to expiration of chapter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 741 PN 1243, FP (Y: 124 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 741 PN 1221, 2017 A3639, PETRARCA (Y: 153 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03555 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 741 PN 903, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 741 PN 1221, 2017 A3639, PETRARCA (Y: 153 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03555 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 741 PN 903, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (124-63) |
2017-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-10-04 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-03 | House | First consideration |
2017-10-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-06-20 | House | In the House |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |