PA SB740 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Act No. 10 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in auditors and accountants, further providing for auditor's compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In auditors and accountants, further providing for auditor's compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Floor: SB 740 PN 856, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 740 PN 856, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseAct No. 10 of 2024
2024-04-15HouseApproved by the Governor
2024-04-09HousePresented to the Governor
2024-03-20HouseSigned in House
2024-04-08HouseSigned in Senate
2024-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-2)
2024-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-03-19HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-03-19HouseSecond consideration
2024-03-18HouseRemoved from table
2023-11-15HouseLaid on the table
2023-11-15HouseFirst consideration
2023-11-15HouseReported as committed
2023-06-28HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2023-06-28HouseIn the House
2023-06-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2023-06-27SenateRe-reported as committed
2023-06-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-06-22SenateSecond consideration
2023-06-21SenateFirst consideration
2023-06-21SenateReported as committed
2023-06-06SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=740
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0740&pn=0856
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/SB0740P0856.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/SB0740P0856.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=06/21/2023&RollCallId=307
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/27/2023&RollCallId=403
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=183
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=11/15/2023&RollCallId=1153
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=905
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=03/20/2024&RollCallId=1415

Bill Comments

feedback