PA SB74 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-22 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-22 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for pediatric cancer research tax credit.
Title
Providing for pediatric cancer research tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 74 PN 1335, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-22 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-11-19 | House | In the House |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-10-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |