PA SB739 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Act No. 10 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Act No. 10 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, further providing for definitions and for assistance to fire companies and EMS companies; in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, establishing the Emergency Medical Services COVID-19 Recovery Grant Program and providing for expiration of authority relating to Emergency Medical Services COVID-19 Recovery Grant Program; and making editorial changes.
Title
In Commonwealth services, further providing for definitions and for assistance to fire companies and EMS companies; in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, establishing the Emergency Medical Services COVID-19 Recovery Grant Program and providing for expiration of authority relating to Emergency Medical Services COVID-19 Recovery Grant Program; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 739 PN 1378, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Floor: SB 739 PN 1378, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03659 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 739 PN 1089, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 739 PN 1378, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Floor: SB 739 PN 1378, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03659 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 739 PN 1089, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Act No. 10 of 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-02-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-02-07 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2022-02-07 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-26 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-26 | House | Second consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-23 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2021-09-22 | House | In the House |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |