PA SB737 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, in repeals, further providing for general repeal.
Title
In repeals, further providing for general repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Gene Yaw [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |