PA SB736 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.
Title
In powers of department and local authorities, further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - House - House Floor: SB 736 PN 899, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 736 PN 899, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 736 PN 899, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-22 | House | Act No. 80 |
2017-12-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-12-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-12-13 | House | Signed in House |
2017-12-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-12-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2017-12-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-12-12 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-12 | House | Second consideration |
2017-12-11 | House | Removed from table |
2017-12-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-12-06 | House | First consideration |
2017-12-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-29 | House | In the House |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |