PA SB729 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 98 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 98 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 9, 1997 (P.L.169, No.14), known as the Nurse Aide Resident Abuse Prevention Training Act, further providing for implementation.
Title
Further providing for implementation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: SB 729 PN 831, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 729 PN 831, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: SB 729 PN 831, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 729 PN 831, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | House | Act No. 98 of 2021 |
2021-12-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-12-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-12-15 | House | Signed in House |
2021-12-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-12-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-12-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-14 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-14 | House | Second consideration |
2021-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-17 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
2021-09-28 | House | In the House |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |