PA SB718 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 13, 1988 (P.L.530, No.94), known as the Environmental Hearing Board Act, further providing for Environmental Hearing Board.
Title
Further providing for Environmental Hearing Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Motion to Remove the Following Bills from the Table, SB 718; SB 956; HB 284 (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Removed from table (36-11) |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Vote by which this bill was removed from table, reconsidered |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |