PA SB703 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of stalking.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of stalking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-05-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |