PA SB701 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to 812 Market, Inc., or its assigns, certain lands and improvements situate in the City of Harrisburg, Dauphin County.
Title
Authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to 812 Market, Inc., or its assigns, certain lands and improvements situate in the City of Harrisburg, Dauphin County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 701 PN 1999, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2018-10-01 | House | In the House |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |