PA SB691 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in organization and jurisdiction of courts of common pleas, further providing for courts of common pleas.
Title
In organization and jurisdiction of courts of common pleas, further providing for courts of common pleas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 691 PN 1770, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-06-15 | House | In the House |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |