PA SB690 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Third consideration and final passage (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for power to convey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for power to convey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: SB 690 PN 829, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 690 PN 829, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2020-01-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-13HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-13HouseSecond consideration
2019-12-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-12-17HouseReported as committed
2019-10-22HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-10-21HouseIn the House
2019-10-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-09-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-24SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as committed
2019-05-31SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=690
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0690&pn=0829
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=331
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/23/2019&RollCallId=494
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=272
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=12/17/2019&RollCallId=1506
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1041
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/14/2020&RollCallId=1614

Bill Comments

feedback