PA SB69 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing Recovery-to-work as a pilot program within the Department of Labor and Industry; and providing for local recovery-to-work pilot programs, for incentives to encourage business participation and for powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry.
Title
Establishing Recovery-to-work as a pilot program within the Department of Labor and Industry; and providing for local recovery-to-work pilot programs, for incentives to encourage business participation and for powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 69 PN 52, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 69 PN 52, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2021-03-17 | House | In the House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (28-20) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |