PA SB69 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for the offense of cruelty to animals.
Title
In riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for the offense of cruelty to animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 69 PN 159 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-01-31 | House | In the House |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |