PA SB681 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Act No. 3A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Act No. 3A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from the Public School Employees' Retirement Fund to provide for expenses of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board for the fiscal year July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017.
Title
Making an appropriation from the Public School Employees' Retirement Fund to provide for expenses of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board for the fiscal year July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-09 - House - House Floor: SB 681 PN 1029, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 681 PN 1029, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 681 PN 1029, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | House | Act No. 3A |
2017-07-21 | House | Became Law without Governor's signature |
2017-07-10 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-07-10 | House | Signed in House |
2017-07-09 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-07-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-1) |
2017-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-29 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-28 | House | In the House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |