PA SB674 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers and duties of elected officials, further providing for surcharge by auditors; in powers, duties and rights of appointed officers and employees, further providing for borough manager created by ordinance and election, for powers and duties, for other offices not incompatible and for organization of commission; and, in taxation and finance, further providing for preparation of budget.
Title
In powers and duties of elected officials, further providing for surcharge by auditors; in powers, duties and rights of appointed officers and employees, further providing for borough manager created by ordinance and election, for powers and duties, for other offices not incompatible and for organization of commission; and, in taxation and finance, further providing for preparation of budget.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 674 PN 745, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-25 | House | In the House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |