PA SB667 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Act No. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Act No. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in land banks, further providing for creation and existence.
Title
In land banks, further providing for creation and existence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 667 PN 1794, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: SB 667 PN 1794, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07189 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 667 PN 888, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: SB 667 PN 1794, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07189 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 667 PN 888, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | Act No. 33 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-04 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-04 | House | Second consideration |
2018-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2017-07-26 | House | In the House |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-3) |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-05-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |