PA SB658 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-17 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-17 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the Eastern hellbender (Cryptobranchus alleganiensis alleganiensis) as the official amphibian of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the Eastern hellbender (Cryptobranchus alleganiensis alleganiensis) as the official amphibian of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 658 PN 776, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-17 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2017-11-15 | House | In the House |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-07-09 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |