PA SB649 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 6, 1989 (P.L.169, No.32), known as the Storage Tank and Spill Prevention Act, in financial provisions, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Environmental Cleanup Program, for Underground Storage Tank Pollution Prevention Program and for investigation and closure costs.
Title
In financial provisions, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Environmental Cleanup Program, for Underground Storage Tank Pollution Prevention Program and for investigation and closure costs.
Sponsors
Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] |
Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-05-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |