PA SB646 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-17 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-17 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1988 (P.L.556, No.101), known as the Municipal Waste Planning, Recycling and Waste Reduction Act, in recycling fee, further providing for recycling fee for municipal waste landfills and resource recovery facilities and for Recycling Fund.
Title
In recycling fee, further providing for recycling fee for municipal waste landfills and resource recovery facilities and for Recycling Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Scott Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - House - House Floor: SB 646 PN 1052, 2017 A2586, CARROLL (Y: 89 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02240 (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 646 PN 734, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - House - House Floor: SB 646 PN 1052, 2017 A2586, CARROLL (Y: 89 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02240 (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 646 PN 734, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-07-09 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-09 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-29 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-06-14 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2017-06-13 | House | In the House |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |