PA SB639 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 1, 1988 (P.L.82, No.16), known as the Pennsylvania Infrastructure Investment Authority Act, further providing for definitions; and providing for additional use of funds for financial assistance.
Title
Further providing for definitions; and providing for additional use of funds for financial assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 639 PN 727, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2017-06-21 | House | In the House |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |