PA SB637 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in criminal history record information, further providing for use of records by licensing agencies; and making related appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In criminal history record information, further providing for use of records by licensing agencies; and making related appeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 637 PN 1392, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-11-21HouseIn the House
2019-11-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-11-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-11-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-18SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-10-30SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-30SenateReported as amended
2019-05-13SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=637
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0637&pn=0780
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0637&pn=1344
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0637&pn=1392
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=10/30/2019&RollCallId=603
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=664
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=360

Bill Comments

feedback