PA SB635 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 43 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 43 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 12 (Commerce and Trade) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in property assessed clean energy program, further providing for purpose, for definitions, for establishment of a program, for notice to lien holder required for participation, for scope of work, for lien and for collection of assessments.
Title
In property assessed clean energy program, further providing for purpose, for definitions, for establishment of a program, for notice to lien holder required for participation, for scope of work, for lien and for collection of assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 635 PN 1125, FP (Y: 148 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 635 PN 1125, Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: A02437: Vote on Amendment Passes A02437 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 635 PN 1125, FP (Y: 148 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 635 PN 1125, Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: A02437: Vote on Amendment Passes A02437 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Act No. 43 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2022-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (148-52) |
2022-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-28 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-12-22 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2021-12-15 | House | In the House |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (42-8) |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |