PA SB634 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in procedure, further providing for exceptions for public records.
Title
In procedure, further providing for exceptions for public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 634 PN 673, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2023-12-13 | House | In the House |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-11-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |