PA SB634 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in transfers of credits between institutions of higher education, further providing for definitions, for duties of public institutions of higher education and for Transfer and Articulation Oversight Committee.
Title
In transfers of credits between institutions of higher education, further providing for definitions, for duties of public institutions of higher education and for Transfer and Articulation Oversight Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-05-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |