PA SB627 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions.
Title
In corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. Jacob Corman [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] |
Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 627 PN 700, FP (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 627 PN 700, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 627 PN 700, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 131 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-15 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2018-04-24 | House | In the House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |