PA SB606 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 29, 1803 (P.L.542, No.156), entitled "An act to establish a Board of Wardens for the port of Philadelphia, and for the regulation of pilots and pilotages, and for other purposes therein mentioned," providing for licensed pilot and apprentice liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of March 29, 1803 (P.L.542, No.156), entitled "An act to establish a Board of Wardens for the port of Philadelphia, and for the regulation of pilots and pilotages, and for other purposes therein mentioned," providing for licensed pilot and apprentice liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-14SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2016-05-09SenateRemoved from table
2016-05-09SenateLaid on the table
2016-03-16SenateRemoved from table
2016-03-16SenateLaid on the table
2016-02-08SenateAmended on third consideration
2015-12-23SenateRemoved from table
2015-12-23SenateLaid on the table
2015-11-23SenateRemoved from table
2015-11-23SenateLaid on the table
2015-10-14SenateRemoved from table
2015-10-14SenateLaid on the table
2015-07-14SenateSecond consideration
2015-06-30SenateFirst consideration
2015-06-30SenateReported as committed
2015-03-06SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback