PA SB601 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 18, 2001 (P.L.949, No.114), known as the Workforce Development Act, in preliminary provisions, providing for preference for training programs.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for preference for training programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |