PA SB60 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for mandate waiver program for transportation.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for mandate waiver program for transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |