PA SB594 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in health and safety, further providing for certification of safety committee.
Title
In health and safety, further providing for certification of safety committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 594 PN 1390, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2020-05-27 | House | In the House |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |