PA SB589 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in military educational programs, further providing for definitions, for eligibility, for grants, for amount of grants, for limitations, for recoupment of grant payments, for regulations, for administration and for Educational Assistance Program Fund and providing for a military family education program; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In military educational programs, further providing for definitions, for eligibility, for grants, for amount of grants, for limitations, for recoupment of grant payments, for regulations, for administration and for Educational Assistance Program Fund and providing for a military family education program; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02169 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 589 PN 733, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-19HouseReported as amended
2019-06-05HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-06-04HouseIn the House
2019-06-04SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2019-06-03SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-05-07SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-07SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-30SenateFirst consideration
2019-04-30SenateReported as amended
2019-04-26SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=589
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0589&pn=0650
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0589&pn=0677
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0589&pn=0733
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0589&pn=1028
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=120
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/03/2019&RollCallId=193
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=90
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=823
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=822

Bill Comments

feedback