PA SB589 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for the definition of "stinger-steered automobile" or "boat transporter"; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for fire apparatus, for length of vehicles and for maximum gross weight of vehicles.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for the definition of "stinger-steered automobile" or "boat transporter"; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for fire apparatus, for length of vehicles and for maximum gross weight of vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 589 PN 887, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 589 PN 887, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 589 PN 887, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 589 PN 887, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Act No. 31 |
2017-07-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-07-10 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-07-09 | House | Signed in House |
2017-07-08 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-07-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2017-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-06 | House | In the House |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |