PA SB583 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 30, 1981 (P.L.128, No.43), known as the Agricultural Area Security Law, further providing for definitions and for purchase of agricultural conservation easements.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for purchase of agricultural conservation easements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 583 PN 642, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2019-05-07 | House | In the House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |