PA SB572 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in public safety, providing for opioid treatment agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public safety, providing for opioid treatment agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 572 PN 1400, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: SB 572 PN 1400, FP (Y: 117 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: SB 572 PN 1285, 2019 A3700, RAPP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03315 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 572 PN 997, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-27SenateAct No. 112
2019-11-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-11-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-11-21SenateSigned in House
2019-11-21SenateSigned in Senate
2019-11-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (28-21)
2019-11-21SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-11-20SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2019-11-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (117-79)
2019-11-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-19HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-19HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-11-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-22HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-22HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-22HouseReported as amended
2019-06-19HouseReferred to HEALTH
2019-06-18HouseIn the House
2019-06-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-17SenateAmended on third consideration
2019-06-05SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-04SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-04SenateReported as amended
2019-04-18SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=572
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0572&pn=0633
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0572&pn=0862
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0572&pn=0997
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0572&pn=1285
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0572&pn=1400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=205
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=144
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=10/22/2019&RollCallId=1195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=10/22/2019&RollCallId=1197
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=853
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=883
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/20/2019&RollCallId=1434
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=11/21/2019&RollCallId=686
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=369

Bill Comments

feedback