PA SB565 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-24SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-23SenateRemoved from table
2020-05-12SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2020-02-05SenateFirst consideration
2020-02-05SenateReported as amended
2019-04-18SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback