PA SB559 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in access to public records during disaster declaration, further providing for definitions and for public records under Right-to-Know Law.
Title
In access to public records during disaster declaration, further providing for definitions and for public records under Right-to-Know Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03978 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 559 PN 738, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 559 PN 738, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-26 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-13 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-21 | House | In the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-05-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |