PA SB552 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 51 (Military Affairs) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military Affairs, further providing for Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund; in State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund; in Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Commission, repealing provisions relating to the Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund and to expiration; and, in registration of vehicles, further providing for Pennsylvania monument registration plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Department of Military Affairs, further providing for Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund; in State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund; in Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Commission, repealing provisions relating to the Pennsylvania Veterans' Memorial Trust Fund and to expiration; and, in registration of vehicles, further providing for Pennsylvania monument registration plate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 552 PN 589, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-10HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-09HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-12HouseReported as committed
2017-10-17HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2017-10-16HouseIn the House
2017-10-16SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-09-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-04-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-19SenateSecond consideration
2017-03-28SenateFirst consideration
2017-03-28SenateReported as committed
2017-03-24SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=552
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0552&pn=0589
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=03/28/2017&RollCallId=75
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/18/2017&RollCallId=432
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=284
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=03/12/2018&RollCallId=1266

Bill Comments

feedback