PA SB531 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, providing for findings regarding firearms and ammunition; and, in preemptions, providing for regulation of firearms and ammunition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, providing for findings regarding firearms and ammunition; and, in preemptions, providing for regulation of firearms and ammunition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-21SenateRemoved from table
2019-11-21SenateLaid on the table
2019-09-25SenateRemoved from table
2019-09-25SenateLaid on the table
2019-06-12SenateRemoved from table
2019-06-12SenateLaid on the table
2019-04-30SenateFirst consideration
2019-04-30SenateReported as committed
2019-04-05SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback