PA SB530 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Signed in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 9, 1987 (P.L.220, No.39), known as the Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists and Professional Counselors Act, further providing for definitions, for qualifications for license, for reciprocity, for restriction on the use of title "licensed clinical social worker," for restrictions on the use of title "Licensed Professional Counselor," for penalties and for unlawful practice; and repealing provisions related to appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for qualifications for license, for reciprocity, for restriction on the use of title "licensed clinical social worker," for restrictions on the use of title "Licensed Professional Counselor," for penalties and for unlawful practice; and repealing provisions related to appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 530 PN 189, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 530 PN 1899, FP (Y: 169 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 530 PN 1166, 2017 A7724, CUTLER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 530 PN 1166, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateSigned in Senate
2018-06-22SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-22SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-06-21SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (169-23)
2018-06-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-20HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-12HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-06HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-14HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-14HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-14HouseReported as committed
2017-10-03HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-10-02HouseIn the House
2017-10-02SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-3)
2017-09-20SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-09-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-19SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-09-18SenateRemoved from table
2017-05-22SenateLaid on the table
2017-04-18SenateFirst consideration
2017-04-18SenateReported as committed
2017-03-24SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=530
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0530&pn=0571
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0530&pn=1166
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0530&pn=1899
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=04/18/2017&RollCallId=99
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/20/2017&RollCallId=455
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=277
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=03/14/2018&RollCallId=1340
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1364
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1394
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1813
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=635
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1047

Bill Comments

feedback