PA SB530 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1987 (P.L.220, No.39), known as the Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists and Professional Counselors Act, further providing for definitions, for qualifications for license, for reciprocity, for restriction on the use of title "licensed clinical social worker," for restrictions on the use of title "Licensed Professional Counselor," for penalties and for unlawful practice; and repealing provisions related to appropriation.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for qualifications for license, for reciprocity, for restriction on the use of title "licensed clinical social worker," for restrictions on the use of title "Licensed Professional Counselor," for penalties and for unlawful practice; and repealing provisions related to appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 530 PN 189, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 530 PN 1899, FP (Y: 169 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 530 PN 1166, 2017 A7724, CUTLER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 530 PN 1166, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 530 PN 189, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 530 PN 1899, FP (Y: 169 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 530 PN 1166, 2017 A7724, CUTLER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 530 PN 1166, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Act No. 76 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-06-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (169-23) |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-06-12 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-06 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-14 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-10-03 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-10-02 | House | In the House |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-3) |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-04-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |