PA SB527 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in educational tax credits, further providing for limitations.
Title
In educational tax credits, further providing for limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A02870 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |