PA SB526 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in auditors and accountants, further providing for completion, filing and publication of annual township report and financial statement.
Title
In auditors and accountants, further providing for completion, filing and publication of annual township report and financial statement.
Sponsors
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 526 PN 1628, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: SB 526 PN 1628, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: SB 526 PN 1628, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 173 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor: SB 526 PN 1295, 2015 A5898, MAHER (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 526 PN 1295, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: SB 526 PN 1628, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: SB 526 PN 1628, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 173 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor: SB 526 PN 1295, 2015 A5898, MAHER (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 526 PN 1295, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | Act No. 14 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-03-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2016-03-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-22 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-18 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-10-28 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-10-26 | House | In the House |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-09-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |