PA SB525 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in agency response, providing for vexatious requester.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In agency response, providing for vexatious requester.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-12SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2024-06-12SenateSecond consideration
2024-04-30SenateFirst consideration
2024-04-30SenateReported as committed
2023-05-03SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback