PA SB521 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for cardiopulmonary resuscitation education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In terms and courses of study, providing for cardiopulmonary resuscitation education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 521 PN 2002, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2018-09-25HouseIn the House
2018-09-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-09-24SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-09-24SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-21SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-05-23SenateRemoved from table
2018-05-23SenateLaid on the table
2018-03-26SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-01-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-23SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-24SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-24SenateReported as committed
2017-06-29SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=521
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0521&pn=1040
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0521&pn=2002
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=10/24/2017&RollCallId=511
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=03/26/2018&RollCallId=727
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=644

Bill Comments

feedback