PA SB52 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the National Guard Youth Challenge Program.
Title
Providing for the National Guard Youth Challenge Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 52 PN 1425, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2018-01-29 | House | In the House |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-07-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |