PA SB519 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for election of members and vacancies.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for election of members and vacancies.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] |
Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-05-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |