PA SB517 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 8, 1982 (P.L.310, No.87), referred to as the Recorder of Deeds Fee Law, further providing for a fee imposed and used for demolition.
Title
Further providing for a fee imposed and used for demolition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |