PA SB513 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, in residual waste, further providing for transportation of residual waste; and abrogating a regulation.
Title
In residual waste, further providing for transportation of residual waste; and abrogating a regulation.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. John Wozniak [D] |
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Scott Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 513 PN 1139, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Floor: SB 513 PN 1139, FP (Y: 172 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: SB 513 PN 1139, 2015 A3138, MOT GERMANE, KILLION (Y: 71 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: SB 513 PN 1139, 2015 A3034, VITALI (Y: 63 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2015-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02877 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02877 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 513 PN 463, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 513 PN 1139, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Floor: SB 513 PN 1139, FP (Y: 172 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: SB 513 PN 1139, 2015 A3138, MOT GERMANE, KILLION (Y: 71 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2015-07-22 - House - House Floor: SB 513 PN 1139, 2015 A3034, VITALI (Y: 63 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2015-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02877 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02877 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 513 PN 463, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Senate | Act No. 45 |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2015-09-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-09-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (172-25) |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-07-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-07-22 | House | Second consideration |
2015-07-01 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-29 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-12 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2015-06-10 | House | In the House |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-05-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |