PA SB510 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, providing for the offense of threat against law enforcement officer or sheriff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In assault, providing for the offense of threat against law enforcement officer or sheriff.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 510 PN 866, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-05-23HouseIn the House
2017-05-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-05-22SenateAmended on third consideration
2017-05-09SenateSecond consideration
2017-04-25SenateFirst consideration
2017-04-25SenateReported as committed
2017-03-10SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback